skip to content

Dello Sbarba, Sarah

CPSO#: 96513

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1500 Av Dollard suite 201
Montreal QC  H8N 1T5
Phone: (514) 366-4507

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sarah Dello Sbarba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dello Sbarba ( CPSO# 96513 )

Business Address:
201 - 1500 Rue Dollard
la salle QC  H8N 1T5
Phone Number: (514) 366-4507


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ontario
Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARAH DELLO SBARBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELLO SBARBA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013