skip to content

Deleon-Matsuda, Maria L

CPSO#: 90470

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of the Philippines, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Woodlands Medical Centre
Suite 204
40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Phone: (519) 759-6116
Fax: (519) 759-7727 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Maria L. Deleon-Matsuda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Deleon-Matsuda ( CPSO# 90470 )

Business Address:
North Woodlands Medical Centre
Suite 204
40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Phone Number: (519) 759-6116

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIA L DELEON-MATSUDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELEON-MATSUDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2011