skip to content

Delage, Antoine

CPSO#: 87581

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Aug 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:12 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2013