skip to content

Del Grande, Robert William

CPSO#: 33154

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Apr 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Perth Smiths Falls Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone: (613) 267-1500 Ext. 4286
Fax: (613) 267-6614 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert W. DelGrande Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Del Grande ( CPSO# 33154 )

Business Address:
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone Number: (613) 267-1500

Business Address:
60 Cornelia Street East
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone Number: (613) 283-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT WILLIAM DEL GRANDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEL GRANDE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1982