skip to content

Deimling, John Peter

CPSO#: 28310

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 May 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 1547 Cunningham Cres Severn ON L3V 7E1
Date Received: 23 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 May 2019