skip to content

Dehoney, Cameron James

CPSO#: 86074

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 09 Apr 2007 to 06 May 2007
EL - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 04 Sep 2007 to 16 Sep 2007
EL - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 17 Sep 2007 to 07 Oct 2007
EL - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2011