skip to content

Dehghan, Niloofar

CPSO#: 88392

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
755 E McDowell Rd, Second floor
Phoenix AZ  85006
United States
Phone: (602) 521-3250

Additional Practice Location(s)

272 Richmond St. East, Suite 100
Toronto ON  M5A 1P4
Canada
Phone: 416-366-4686
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Niloofar Dehghan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Dehghan ( CPSO# 88392 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
272 Richmond Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1P4
Phone Number: (416) 366-4686


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NILOOFAR DEHGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEHGHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013