skip to content

Degani, Aqeel Cassim

CPSO#: 88391

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rideau Valley Health Centre
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 5V7
Phone: (613) 258-8710 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Med-Team Clinic
99 Kakulu Rd
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Degani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Degani ( CPSO# 88391 )

Business Address:
Rideau Valley Health Centre
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 5V7
Phone Number: (613) 258-8710

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AQEEL CASSIM DEGANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEGANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2010