skip to content

Deernsted, Eric August

CPSO#: 26631

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Aug 2002
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 Feb 1980
Summary:

 In February 1980, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Deernsted guilty of professional misconduct, 
 as defined in Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he falsified a record in respect of 
 the examination or treatment of a patient, contrary to s. 26(15); and in that he committed sexual 
 impropriety with a patient, contrary to s. 26(28).  Consequently the Committee ruled that Dr. 
 Deernsted be reprimanded and that his licence be suspended for a period of thirty days.

Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 30 Jan 1980