skip to content

Debow, Stanley Lawrence

CPSO#: 19673

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 20 Dec 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Aug 1965

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stanley Debow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 1 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: 914 Dupont Street, Toronto, Ontario M6H 1Z2
Date Received: 20 Dec 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Dec 2018