skip to content

Death, Arthur Barry

CPSO#: 21469

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jan 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jan 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A.B. Death Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 21 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Parkwood Hospital 550 Wellington Rd London ON N6C 0A7
Date Received: 08 Jan 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jan 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jan 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 20, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)