skip to content

Dean, Malcolm Hewlin Clark

CPSO#: 13149

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 25 Oct 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Oct 1999

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1950
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1989
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1999