skip to content

Deacon, James Emile Joseph

CPSO#: 31984

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 05 May 2021
EXPIRY DATE
05 May 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: James Deacon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 28 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Quarry Medical 2300 Princess Street Kingston, ON K7M 3G4
Date Received: 05 May 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 May 2021