skip to content

DeLyzer, Tanya Lynn

CPSO#: 90554

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC - Victoria Campus
Room E2-648
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58108
Fax: (519) 685-8114 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Luc Dubois Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Dubois ( CPSO# 82478 )
Dr. T. DeLyzer ( CPSO# 90554 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Room E2 - 648
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Room E2 117
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8161

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:19 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TANYA LYNN DELYZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELYZER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 13 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 14 Jul 2014 to 18 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Dec 2016 to 28 Feb 2017
CF - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015