skip to content

De, Sabe Kumar

CPSO#: 87970

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
Room B6-129A
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3428
Fax: (519) 663-3764 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sabe De Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. De ( CPSO# 87970 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
Room B6 - 129A
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3428


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:12 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SABE KUMAR DE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2011