skip to content

De Sa, Vincent Xavier

CPSO#: 28882

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Swahili

Education:University College of East Africa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vincent Desa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 23 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: 194 Court Street North, Thunder Bay, ON, P7A 4V7
Date Received: 03 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016