skip to content

De Ribaupierre, Sandrine Nathalie

CPSO#: 85341

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice as of 20 Jan 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Geneva, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
Room B1 181
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58107
Fax: (519) 685-8171 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sandrine De Ribaupierre Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. De Ribaupierre ( CPSO# 85341 )

Business Address:
LHSC - Victoria Campus Site
Division of Neurosurgery
Room B1 181
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:02 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANDRINE NATHALIE DE RIBAUPIERRE may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO in which Dr. DE RIBAUPIERRE holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. DE RIBAUPIERRE may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. DE RIBAUPIERRE no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. DE RIBAUPIERRE no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. DE RIBAUPIERRE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 20 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 21 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2015