skip to content

De La Rocha, Claudio Alberto Gonzalez

CPSO#: 25007

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Feb 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Feb 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Provis Rudd Clinic 123 Edward St Toronto, ON M5G 1E2
Date Received: 25 Feb 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 11 Mar 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Feb 2019

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Apr 1995
Summary:

In April 1995, Dr. de la Rocha pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s.61(3)(a) of the Health 
Disciplines Act, 1990, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice.    The 
Discipline Committe accepted Dr. de la Rocha s plea of guilty and found him guilty of professional misconduct.   
Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty: 
 
   1. Dr. de la Rocha's licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of ninety days. 
 
   2. This period of suspension was itself to be suspended, provided that Dr. de la Rocha, within fifteen days after the date 
      upon which this Order became final, filed a written undertaking with the Registrar to prepare a proposal for a protocol 
      for use in community hospitals, concerning the withdrawal of life support from terminally ill patients, and provided 
      further that: 
 
      (a) he submitted to the Registrar, within thirty days of filing the written undertaking, an organizational plan for 
          the development of the proposal for the protocol; 
 
      (b) the proposal for the protocol addressed the pharmacological management of symptoms, as well as the 
          subjects of informal consent, ethics, patient autonomy, and the involvement of the family and the family 
          physician in the decision-making process; 
 
      (c) in the course of preparation of the protocol, Dr. de la Rocha reviewed relevant literature and consulted widely 
          with experts in palliative care, ethics and critical care, and with patients' rights organizations; 
 
      (d) the proposal for a protocol was of such a quality as to render it suitable for submission to a peer-reviewed 
          journal, and was submitted by Dr. de la Rocha for consideration for publication by such a journal; 
 
      (e) Dr. de la Rocha, within 270 days of filing the written undertaking, submitted to the Registrar a copy of the 
          proposal for a protocol, and also written confirmation that he complied with sections 2(b), 2(c) and 2(d) cited 
          above. 
 
   3. In the event that, having filed the written undertaking referred to in section 2 above, Dr. de la Rocha failed to comply 
      with the deadlines contained in sections 2(a) or 2(e) cited above, his licence to practice would thereupon be 
      suspended for a period of ninety days, such suspension to commence immediately following such failure to comply. 
 
   4. These penalties were to be recorded in the Register. 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 03, 1995

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 14, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)