skip to content

De Jong, Peggy Marie

CPSO#: 86176

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Armstrong 3
Kingston General Hospital
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3225
Fax: (613) 548-1387 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Echo Lab, Armstrong 3
Kingston General Hospital
Kingston Health Sciences Center
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3980
Fax: (613) 548-1387
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Brock 2 Cardiology
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Kingston Health Sciences Center
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3225
Fax: (613) 548-1387
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. P.M. De Jong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. De Jong ( CPSO# 86176 )

Business Address:
Echo Lab, Armstrong 3
Kingston General Hospital
Kingston Health Science Center
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Brock 2 Cardiology
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Kingston Health Science Centre
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PEGGY MARIE DE JONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE JONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2011