skip to content

De Jager, Peter Salomon Christopher

CPSO#: 96827

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-5649 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Peter S.C. De Jager Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. De Jager ( CPSO# 96827 )
Dr. T. O'Brien ( CPSO# 108902)

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 583-6399

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:01 Oct 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Apr 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2013 Active
             Dr.  Peter  Salomon Christopher De Jager may practice medicine independently in
            Emergency Medicine, only.