skip to content

De Groot, Gerrit Willem

CPSO#: 31929

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Jan 1981

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:12 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Sep 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008