skip to content

De Graft-Johnson, Ama

CPSO#: 32002

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Dec 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Akan, English

Education:Univ of Ghana, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: DeGraft-Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 May 2019

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 23, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ama De Graft-Johnson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 23, 2018:

Dr. De-Graft Johnson has retired from the practice of medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.
Download Full Document (PDF)