skip to content

De Carli, Claudio Fabian

CPSO#: 85575

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Oct 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Cordoba, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 07 Sep 2006 to 05 Oct 2006
PEAP - CF - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 06 Oct 2006 to 06 Sep 2007
CF - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 07 Sep 2007 to 06 Sep 2008
CF - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 07 Sep 2008 to 30 Oct 2008
CF - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 31 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009