skip to content

De Bosset, Philippe

CPSO#: 26799

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Feb 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Feb 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Lausanne, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com For files created after June 2006, patients can contact the College for more information regarding where to find there medical records.
Date Received: 19 Feb 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 18 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Feb 2013