skip to content

De Alwis, Watutantrige Assajee

CPSO#: 26396

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 10 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact: Dr. Michael Murray 72 Brant Avenue Brantford, ON N3T 5Z8 Tel: (519) 756-4310
Date Received: 30 Mar 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2009