skip to content

Dayal-Harbour, Anita Mary

CPSO#: 95691

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thompson Medical Centre
990 Gainsborough Road
London ON  N6H 5L4
Phone: (519) 601-8621 Ext. 102
Fax: 519-204-3122 Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:15 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANITA MARY DAYAL-HARBOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAYAL-HARBOUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Neurology

Western University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Western University, 22 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Western University, 22 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Western University, 09 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 08 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2017