skip to content

Daya, Salim Haiderali

CPSO#: 31386

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jun 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Feb 2006
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Kachchi

Education:University of Manchester, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Newlife Fertility Centre
4250 Sherwoodtowne Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L4Z 2G6
Phone: (905) 896-7100 Ext. 131
Fax: (905) 896-7200 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

NewLife Fertility Centre
Unit 210
2 Dewside Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 0X5
Canada
Phone: (905) 896-7100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Newlife Fertility Centre
670 Highway 7
Unit 8
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P2
Canada
Phone: 905 886 7300
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Newlife Fertility Centre
8760 Jane Street
Building A
Suite 101
Concord ON  L4K 4V3
Canada
Phone: 905 896 7199 Ext. 830
Fax: 905 896 7299
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Salim Daya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Daya ( CPSO# 31386 )

Business Address:
210 - 2 Dewside Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 0X5

Business Address:
103 - 7777 Kipling Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4L 2Z3

Business Address:
8 - 670 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P2

Business Address:
Newlife Fertility Centre
4250 Sherwoodtowne Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L4Z 2G6
Phone Number: (905) 896-7100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 20 Feb 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 22 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 25 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 06 Nov 2018

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 06 Nov 2018 Active
             (1of 2)
            As from November 6, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Salim Haiderali Daya,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Daya to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. SALIM HAIDERALI DAYA  
                                          ("Dr. Daya")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Daya, certificate of registration number 31386, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Daya, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215814 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct or am incompetent in my infertility practice
                  including my OHIP claims and delegation to non-physicians.

            (4)   I, Dr. Daya, acknowledge that, after the College receives an original
                  copy of this Undertaking as signed by me, no further action will be taken
                  on the Investigation. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Daya, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (6)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Daya, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the
                        "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for at least six
                        (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Daya, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month for three (3)
                              months and then once every quarter; 
                  
                        (iv)  Direct observation of a half day, once every month, to assess
                              clinical ability and OHIP billing;
                  
                        (v)   Review at least forty (40) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (vi)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (viii)Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (ix)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month for the first three months and then after each further
                              attendance at my practice for observation and/or chart
                              review, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Daya, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected
                        by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the report of the medical
                        inspector dated March 28, 2018, and concerns that may arise during
                        the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Daya, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Daya, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Daya, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Daya, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Daya, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as
                        a result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Daya, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program or programs satisfactory to the College in medical
                              record keeping; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Daya, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Daya, undertake to complete this requirement by April 1,
                        2019 or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
                        the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Daya, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Daya, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6) above
                        and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Daya, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Daya, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
            (d)   I, Dr. Daya, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be
                  provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form
                  the basis of further action by the College. 

            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Daya, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Daya, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Daya, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Daya, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent,
                        attached hereto as Appendix "C".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Daya, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Daya, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Daya, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Daya, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Daya, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (15)  I, Dr. Daya, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Daya, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Daya, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Daya
                              engaged in professional misconduct or is incompetent in his
                              infertility practice including his OHIP claims and delegation
                              to non-physicians. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Daya will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                                    Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months. 
                  
                                    Dr. Daya will engage in professional education in
                                    medical record keeping.
                  
                                    Dr. Daya's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College within approximately six (6)
                                    months of the end of the period of Clinical
                                    Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Daya, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Daya, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Daya, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Daya, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or 

                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
                  
            (2 of 2)
            As from February 20, 2006, Dr. Salim Haiderali Daya undertakes to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario the following:

                  1.    (a)   I will not perform the Tompkins Metroplasty procedure;
                  
                        (b)   Prior to performing any other type of metroplasty, I will
                              obtain a second opinion, in writing, from a specialist
                              acceptable to the College that a metroplasty is indicated,
                              and that the metroplasty procedure that I propose to perform
                              is the appropriate one in the circumstances; and
                  
                        (c)   I intend to resume a gynaecology surgical practice and there
                              has been no recent assessment of my surgical skills.  Prior
                              to performing any unsupervised surgical procedures, I will
                              advise the College of my intention to do so and undergo an
                              evaluation and, if necessary on the basis of the evaluation,
                              training acceptable to the College.  I will ensure that the
                              most responsible physician is acceptable to the College.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: November 6, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Salim Haiderali Daya to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 6, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Daya engaged in professional misconduct or is incompetent in his infertility practice including his OHIP claims and delegation to non-physicians. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Daya will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

Dr. Daya will engage in professional education in medical record keeping.

Dr. Daya’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within approximately six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 7, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)