Daya, Nushin (CPSO#: 89780)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leicester, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postmaster Medical Clinic
2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 0N2
Phone: (905) 844-1700
Fax: (905) 844-1705
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nushin Daya Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Daya ( CPSO# 89780 )

Business Address:
Postmaster Medical Clinic
2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 0N2
Phone Number: (416) 902-1105

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NUSHIN DAYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAYA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2010