skip to content

Dawson, David Fredrick Laing

CPSO#: 24714

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 May 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

231 Bay Street North
Hamilton ON  L8R 2R1
Canada
Phone: (905) 540-8532
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

55 Wyndham Street N
#212
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Canada
Phone: 519 837-4444
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David F. L. Dawson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dawson ( CPSO# 24714 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2300

Business Address:
212 - 55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone Number: (519) 837-4444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:13 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 01 May 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 26 Apr 2019 Active
 
As from April 26, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. David Frederick Liang Dawson in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Dawson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")

of
 
DR. DAVID FREDRICK LIANG DAWSON
("Dr. Dawson")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
________________________________________________________________________

A.	PREAMBLE
(1)	In this Undertaking:
"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 
"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public. 
(2)	I, Dr. Dawson, certificate of registration number 24714, am a member of the College.  
(3)	I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that concerns were identified with respect to my knowledge, skill and judgment, following which I underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of my practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about my standard of practice in psychiatry.
B.	UNDERTAKING
(4)	I, Dr. Dawson, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective August 1, 2021.
(5)	I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that, other than in Ontario, I am not currently registered to practise medicine in any other jurisdiction, and I further acknowledge that I currently do not have any outstanding applications for registration to practice medicine in any jurisdiction.
(6)	I, Dr. Dawson, undertake that, effective August 1, 2021, I will not practise medicine in any jurisdiction until each and every one of the following conditions have been met:
(a)	I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College of my intent to return to the practice of medicine; and
(b)	I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a program of continuing professional development that meets the requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for continuing professional development set by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada.
(7)	I, Dr. Dawson, undertake that upon my return to the practice of medicine, I shall, at minimum:
(a)	practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College for three (3) months;
(b)	complete professional education in the areas of pharmacotherapy for venlaxafine, modafinil, escitalopram; collaborative care; and medical record-keeping; and
(c)	submit to a reassessment of my practice six (6) months after completion of the clinical supervision and professional education.
(8)	I, Dr. Dawson, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking I shall forward a request to the General Manager of OHIP that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise and before the date the College agrees that I may return to practise in accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
(9)	I, Dr. Dawson, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Closing a Medical Practice. I also undertake to abide by the College's "Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice and/or Re-entering Practice" Policy. 
C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS
(10)	I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(11)	I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
(12)	I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(13)	I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.
(14)	I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.
(15)	Public Register
(a)	I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b)	I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
Dr. Dawson underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of my practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about Dr. Dawson's standard of practice in psychiatry. As of August 1, 2021, Dr. Dawson ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.
D.	CONSENT
(16)	I, Dr. Dawson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
(17)	I, Dr. Dawson, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and that the consent forms part of this Undertaking.



Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 26, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Frederick Laing Dawson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 26, 2021:

Dr. Dawson underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of my practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about Dr. Dawson’s standard of practice in psychiatry. As of August 1, 2021, Dr. Dawson ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.