skip to content

Dawood, Shamim

CPSO#: 89945

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Karnatak University Dharwar, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MATTHEWS GATE MEDICAL CLINIC
UNIT# 4
3662 HURONTARIO STREET
Mississauga ON  L5B 1P3
Phone: 905 232 3600
Fax: (905) 232 2900 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Dawood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dawood ( CPSO# 89945 )

Business Address:
Matthews Gate Medical Clinic
Unit 4
3662 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 232-3600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Jan 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAMIM DAWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 21 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 13 Jan 2009 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 18 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011