skip to content

Dawood, Ashraf Mohammed Abdulrahman

CPSO#: 92985

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 31 May 2010 to 25 Jun 2010
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2013
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017