skip to content

Davison, Peter Diarmuid

CPSO#: 27636

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 May 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
3328 McCarthy Rd
Ottawa ON  K1V 9X5
Phone: (613) 738-1564 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Peter Davison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 18 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 01 May 2018
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 02 May 2018
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 02 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 13 Aug 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 13 Aug 2019 Active
             (1 of 2)
            As from August 13, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Peter Diarmuid
            Davison in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Davison to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. PETER DIARMUID DAVISON
                                          ("Dr. Davison")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.

            (2)   I, Dr. Davison, certificate of registration number 27636, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Davison, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7216367 & 7215330 (the "Investigation") into whether
                  I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my general
                  practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Davison, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Davison, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program or programs satisfactory to the College in: 
                  
                              1.    Mood Disorders; and
                  
                              2.    Medical Record Keeping.
                  
                        (ii)  review and written summary of:
                  
                              1.    CPSO Prescribing Drugs policy;
                  
                              2.    Suicide Prevention Toolkit for Primary Care Practices;
                  
                              3.    American Family Physician - Common Questions About the
                                    Pharmacologic Management of Depression in Adults;  
                  
                              4.    CPSO Medical Records Policy; and
                  
                              5.    CPSO Test Results Management Policy.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Davison, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Davison, undertake to complete this requirement within six
                        (6) months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that
                        time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Davison, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Davison, undertake that, approximately twelve (12) months
                        after the completion of the Educational requirement set out in
                        section (6) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice
                        ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the
                        College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the
                        Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of my
                        care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Davison, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Davison, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Davison, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Davison, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Davison, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Davison, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS, and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Davison, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "B" and Appendix "C",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Davison, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Davison, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Davison, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr. Davison, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (12)  I, Dr. Davison, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Davison, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Davison, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
                              Davison engaged in professional misconduct and/or is
                              incompetent in his general practice. As a result of the
                              investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Davison will engage in professional education in
                                    mood disorders, prescribing, record keeping and tests
                                    management.
                  
                                    Dr. Davison's practice will be reassessed by an
                                    assessor selected by the College within twelve (12)
                                    months of completing the educational requirements of
                                    this undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Davison, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Davison, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Davison, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Davison, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff
                  and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the
                  following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (d)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
                  
                  
            (2 of 2)
            As from 3:00 p.m., May 1, 2018, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following term, condition
            and limitation is imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Peter
            Diarmuid Davison:

                  Dr. Davison will successfully complete one on one instructions in medical
                  ethics with an instructor approved by the College, at his own expense,
                  within six months of the date of this Order, and shall provide proof of
                  completion to the College.

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 May 2018
Summary:

On May 1, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Peter Diarmuid Davison committed an 
act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant 
to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all of the circumstances, would reasonably be 
regarded by members as unprofessional.  
 
Dr. Davison is a family physician practising in Ottawa. He received his certificate of registration 
authorizing independent practice from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario in 
1975. 
 
Patient A 
 
Patient A, a man in his 90s, has been a patient of Dr. Davison since mid-1990s. Dr. Davison has 
followed Patient A for his general primary care needs, including with respect to hypertension, 
osteoarthritis, coronary artery disease, B12injections, respiratory concerns, situational mood 
issues related to the passing of his family member and ongoing sleep issues.  
 
In 2015, a general evaluation was conducted of Patient A at the Hospital by a geriatric nurse. The 
outcome of the evaluation was “suspected dementia” and “probable mixed mild dementia”. 
Following this, Dr. Davison completed an assessment for Patient A in support of his application 
for admission into a long-term care home and completed an Ontario Pharmacist Association 
Notification Form in April 2016, which was provided in support of a more frequent medication 
dispensing interval for Patient A. Dr. Davison described that Patient A “forgets to take his 
medications” and is late for refills “up to 1 month sometimes”.  
 
In July of 2016, Dr. Davison was experiencing acute financial difficulties, both of a professional 
and personal nature, including with respect to paying office rent. He turned to a close friend for 
help, who was unable to provide him with financial assistance. He petitioned his office landlord 
to come to a workable solution and the landlord partially agreed, but some funds were still 
needed in order to get back into the office. Given his age and stage of career, he was also deeply 
embarrassed by the circumstances. Aside from his wife and close friend, he did not share details 
of his financial difficulties with other family members, including his children, nor did he seek 
support from additional friends or family. 
     
Dr. Davison visited Patient A at his condominium, where he lives alone, and requested financial 
assistance from Patient A. No-one besides Dr. Davison and Patient A was present for this 
discussion. Patient A agreed and provided a cheque for $10,000 to Dr. Davison. Dr. Davison 
indicated he would return the money once he was in a position to do so and cashed Patient A’s 
cheque on July 28, 2016. In August 2016, Dr. Davison attended at Patient A’s condominium 
again to advise that he was not yet in a position to return the money. He expected to receive a 
payment from OHIP in mid-August which had not yet arrived as expected. No-one besides Dr. 
Davison and Patient A was present for this discussion. 
     
The College received a complaint about Dr. Davison on September 1, 2016 from a close friend 
of Patient A, Ms. B. Dr. Davison was verbally notified of the complaint on September 12, 2016 
and in writing on September 19, 2016. On September 20, 2016 Dr. Davison received a payment 
from OHIP. That same day, Dr. Davison provided a cheque, dated September 20, 2016 to Patient 
A in the amount of $10,000, together with a thank you card. The cheque was cashed on 
September 22, 2016. 
     
In November of 2016 College Investigator spoke with Patient A, who indicated that Dr. Davison 
had repaid him and that he had deposited the cheque. When the Investigator requested 
confirmation that the cheque was deposited, Patient A responded that as far as he was concerned 
the matter was closed.  
     
In his response to the College, dated October 31, 2016, Dr. Davison indicated that the decision to 
approach Patient A was made while he was under a considerable amount of stress, which he 
acknowledged and understood was misguided. While he believed at the time that he and Patient 
A were on equal footing and that Patient A was not a vulnerable person, he appreciated that he 
put Patient A in a difficult position and he apologized to Patient A. 
     
The College commenced investigation on March 12, 2017. Dr. Davison cooperated with the 
College’s investigation.  He has no prior history of any discipline proceeding. 
 
Disposition 
 
On May 1, 2018, the Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
-  The Registrar suspend Dr. Davison’s certificate of registration for a three month period, to 
   commence at 12:01 a.m. on May 2, 2018. 
-  The Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Davison’s 
   Certificate of Registration: Dr. Davison will successfully complete one on one instructions 
   in medical ethics with an instructor approved by the College, at his own expense, within six 
   months of the date of this Order, and shall provide proof of completion to the College. 
-  Dr. Davison appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Davison pay to the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $5,500 within 
   thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): May 1, 2018, start time 1:00 p.m.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: August 13, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Peter Diarmuid Davison to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 13, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Davison engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his general practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Davison will engage in professional education in mood disorders, prescribing, record keeping and tests management.

Dr. Davison’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within twelve (12) months of completing the educational requirements of this undertaking.