skip to content

Davison, Kelly

CPSO#: 89775

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:21 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 19 Sep 2008
EL - Hematology

University of Toronto, 13 Feb 2011 to 13 Mar 2011
EL - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jun 2013