skip to content

Davis-Faroque, Nicole

CPSO#: 93260

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction and Mental Hea
1051 Queen Street West
Crisis and Critical Care Bldg Unit
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: 416-535-8501 Ext. 36108
Fax: 416-979- 6882 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nicole Davis-Faroque Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Davis-Faroque ( CPSO# 93260 )

Business Address:
1001 Queen St W
Centre for Addition and Mental Health, 1051 Queen
Unit 5, Crisis & Critical Care Building
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: 416-535-8501

Business Address:
1001 Queen St W
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: 416-535-8501

Business Address:
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICOLE DAVIS-FAROQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS-FAROQUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2016