skip to content

Davis, Neil Leonard

CPSO#: 91909

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Mar 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Mar 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
Department of Pathology
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Neil Davis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Davis ( CPSO# 91909 )

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
Department of Pathology
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:23 Jul 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2011 Active
             Dr.  Neil  Leonard  Davis  may  practise  medicine  independently in anatomical
            pathology, only.