skip to content

Davis, Matthew Theodore

CPSO#: 86336

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus Site
Department of Emergency Medicine
Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Davis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Davis ( CPSO# 86336 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Campus Site
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW THEODORE DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012