skip to content

Davis, Kathleen Anne

CPSO#: 31122

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Sep 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
701 - 2197 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7X3
Phone: 613-567-3767
Fax: 613-567-1481 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

105 - 2249 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K2B 7E9
Canada
Phone: 613-798-7272
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kathleen A. Davis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Davis ( CPSO# 31122 )

Business Address:
701-2197 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7X3
Phone Number: (613) 567-3767

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS - Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent South North York, ON M3J 1Y6 Phone Number: 1-888-563-3732 Ext 1
Date Received: 02 Jan 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:08 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN ANNE DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1979