skip to content

Davis, Geoffrey Brian

CPSO#: 30066

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
30 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 19 Oct 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Geoffrey Davis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 29 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Oct 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 2021

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Geoffrey Brian Davis to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 19, 2017:

The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring System about Dr. Davis’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Based on the information received, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Davis failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Davis will not take on any new patients with chronic non-cancer pain, with the exception of new patients whose care he assumes for the purpose of providing palliative care.

Dr. Davis’s prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and
other monitored drugs will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for minimum of nine (9) months.

Dr. Davis will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Following the professional education and period of supervision, Dr. Davis’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.