skip to content

Davis, Andrew

CPSO#: 98318

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Feb 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
535 Belmont Street
Suite 102
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E9
Phone: 519-576-1630
Fax: 519-576-4461 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrew Davis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Davis ( CPSO# 98318 )

Business Address:
Suite 208 and 204
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 576-2992

Business Address:
Unit 23B
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone Number: (519) 578-3510

Business Address:
102-520 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2T 2Z6
Phone Number: (519) 576-4910

Business Address:
Suite 102
535 Belmont Street
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E9
Phone Number: (519) 576-1630

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2016