Davis, Adrienne Lazar (CPSO#: 98801)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Cornell University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 202384
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIENNE LAZAR DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2014