skip to content

Davila Acosta, Jorge Humberto

CPSO#: 87967

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jan 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jan 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Peruana Cayetano Heredia University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Radiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3582
Fax: (613) 738-4811 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Davila Acosta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Davila Acosta ( CPSO# 87967 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Radiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatric Radiology Effective:02 Mar 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Neuroradiology Effective:02 Mar 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:04 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 07 Mar 2008
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Mar 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Mar 2016 Active
             Dr.  Jorge  Humberto  Davila  Acosta  may  practise  medicine  independently in
            paediatric radiology and neuroradiology.