skip to content

Davies, Ross Andrew

CPSO#: 28017

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Nov 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Nov 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Heart Inst.
Room 1295-C
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7321
Fax: (613) 696-7138 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ross A. Davies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Davies ( CPSO# 28017 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Suite H1295-C
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7321


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Newfoundland and Labrador

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROSS ANDREW DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Nov 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1979