skip to content

Davies, Mary Patricia

CPSO#: 26353

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St Josephs Health Centre 30 The Queensway Toronto, ON M6B 1B5
Date Received: 30 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:01 Dec 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2015