skip to content

Davies, Justine Juliette Mandy

CPSO#: 86575

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Rose Ages Breast Health Center
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-761-4400
Fax: 613-761-4994 Electoral District: 07
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Medical Records Location
Address: RSRS 111 St Regis Cres. South Toronto, ON M3J l Y6
Phone: 1-888-563-3732 Ext. 1
Date Received: 30 Jun 2022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JUSTINE JULIETTE MANDY DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 27 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2009