skip to content

Davies, Gwynivere Amber

CPSO#: 95121

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Mar 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 3-16, 3rd Floor
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
699 Concession St
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 62491
Fax: (905) 575-6340 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gwynivere Davies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Davies ( CPSO# 95121 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
Room 3155, Cancer Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 708-4985

Business Address:
699 Concession St
Juravinski Cancer Centre, Room 3-16
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: 905-521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:04 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GWYNIVERE AMBER DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2017