skip to content

Davies, Anne Marie

CPSO#: 96715

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
10 Sep 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:17 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
EL - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2021
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Sep 2021