skip to content

Davie, Wendy Hoa Ai

CPSO#: 93415

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayside Medical Centre
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1B9
Phone: (705) 549-3939 Electoral District: 05

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical records should contact: Bayside Medical Centre, 3 Beck Boulevard, Penetanguishene, ON, L9M 1B9, Tel: 705-549-3939
Date Received: 26 Sep 2019


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WENDY HOA AI DAVIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2013