skip to content

Davidson, Simon Issac

CPSO#: 32287

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Apr 1981

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Simon Davidson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 22 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ontario Health Records 401 Smyth Rd Ottawa, ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 18 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:08 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017