skip to content

Davidson, Murray

CPSO#: 18851

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Mar 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Mar 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd, 13-1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, Ontario M9L 0A3
Date Received: 27 Feb 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1961
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 2019