Concerns
Source:
FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Jurisdiction Notices
Active Date: May 25, 2022
Summary:
On May 25, 2022, the New York State Board for Professional Medical Conduct made a finding that Dr. Davidson was guilty of professional misconduct as a result of action taken by the Medical Board of California against Dr. Davidson on February 24, 2021. The New York State Board found that the conduct upon which the disciplinary action by the California Board was based, if committed in New York, would constitute professional misconduct under the laws of the State of New York for failing to maintain a record for each patient which accurately reflects the evaluation and treatment of the patient. The New York State Board did not impose a penalty on Dr. Davidson. The College was notified of this finding by a report from FSMB dated June 8, 2022.
Source:
FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Jurisdiction Notices
Active Date: February 24, 2021
Summary:
On January 25, 2021, the Medical Board of California, with the agreement of Dr. Davidson, made a decision and order effective February 24, 2021:issuing a public reprimand made in connection with Dr. Davidson’s violation of the Medical Practice Act for his failure to perform and/or document an adequate physical examination of a patient;that Dr. Davidson is required to complete Board-approved educational programs or courses aimed at correcting any areas of deficient practice or knowledge, and following the completion of each, the Board may administer an examination to test Dr. Davidson’s knowledge of the course; that Dr. Davidson shall complete a course in medical record keeping approved by the Board; andthat Dr. Davison shall complete a professionalism program (ethics course) that meets the requirements of the California Code of Regulations.The College was notified of this finding by a report dated March 16, 2021.